Lemeshko, Olga Viktorivna (CPSO#: 99475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Lemeshko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Lemeshko ( CPSO# 99475 )

Business Address:
20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 507-1111

Business Address:
Trafalgar Medical Clinic
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTORIVNA LEMESHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMESHKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 07 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2015