Lemyre, Brigitte (CPSO#: 73170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neonatology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: (613) 737-8889
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8561
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Lemyre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lemyre ( CPSO# 73170 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Division of Neonatology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIGITTE LEMYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMYRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001