Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lena, Anthony Ilango (CPSO#: 64293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BLUE WATER HEALTH
89 NORMAN STREET
SARNIA
ONTARIO
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5407
Fax: (519) 464-4486
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Ilango Lena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lena ( CPSO# 64293 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ILANGO LENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1995