Lencses, Kathy Ann (CPSO#: 82557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4618
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Health Care
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Minet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHY ANN LENCSES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENCSES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012