Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lenkov, Pamela Lynn (CPSO#: 56918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Toronto Health
Services
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 971-2089
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre - Clinical Breast
Services Division
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
Breast Centre
76 Grenville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA LYNN LENKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENKOV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987