Lennox, Bruce Martin (CPSO#: 19281)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce M. Lennox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 244 Riverview Boulevard Street St Catharines, ON L2T 3M8
Instructions: Patients may send a signed request to Dr. Lennox at above address.
Date Received: 07 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015