Leonard, Brian Clark (CPSO#: 23552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8574
Fax: (613) 739-6645
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leonard ( CPSO# 23552 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8574

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1976