Lester, Michael Leon (CPSO#: 19581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Urgent Care
Suite C107
3885 Duke Of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Phone: 905 366 4441
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dixon Walk In Clinic
Suite 106
222 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3S5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from July 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Leon Lester,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lester to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. MICHAEL LEON LESTER
                                            ("Dr. Lester") 
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the   Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lester, certificate of registration number 19581, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Lester, understand that the Registrar of the College has appointed
                  investigators under section 75(1)(a) of the Code to inquire into my
                  conduct (the "Investigation").  

            (4)   I, Dr. Lester, understand that this Undertaking does not resolve the
                  Investigation or preclude the College from taking further action in
                  respect of the Investigation but is an interim measure to ensure the
                  protection of the public.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING 

            (5)   I, Dr. Lester, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lester, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall not
                        engage in any professional encounters with patients of any age, in
                        any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                        presence of a monitor who is a female and is approved by the
                        College (the "Practice Monitor") and unless the other requirements
                        provided in this Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I
                        will not be alone with any parent or guardian of the patient, or
                        any patient, for any length of time, during any professional
                        encounter.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor, including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                              1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice
                                    Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a
                                    monthly basis; 
                  
                              2.    remaining in the examination or consulting room at all
                                    times during all professional encounters with all
                                    patients; 
                  
                              3.    carefully observing all of my professional encounters
                                    with patients, including but not limited to physical
                                    examinations. I further acknowledge my obligation to
                                    ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of my
                                    professional encounters with patients, including
                                    physical examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                              4.    maintaining a log of all patient encounters in the form
                                    attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the
                                    "Log") and in the manner described in Appendix "A";
                  
                              5.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                                    patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                              6.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                                    basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lester, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
                        Log at all times, and to make it available to the College upon
                        request. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Lester, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                  further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (10)  I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking, and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the HPPC.  I understand that this entire
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Lester is the subject of a College investigation into his
                        conduct.  During the course of the investigation, Dr. Lester has
                        agreed not to engage in any professional encounters with patients
                        of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes
                        place in the presence of a monitor who is a female acceptable to
                        the College, and unless the other requirements provided in his
                        Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity,
                        Dr. Lester will not be alone with any parent or guardian of the
                        patient, or any patient, for any length of time, during any
                        professional encounter.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Lester, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Lester, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (16)  I, Dr. Lester, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and to the inspection of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Lester, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Lester, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Lester, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Leon Lester to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 18, 2016:

Dr. Lester is the subject of a College investigation into his conduct. During the course of the investigation, Dr. Lester has agreed not to engage in any professional encounters with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Lester will not be alone with any parent or guardian of the patient, or any patient, for any length of time, during any professional encounter.