Lett, Darren Andrew (CPSO#: 80050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clergy Street Family Physicians
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone: (613) 542-7858
Fax: (613) 544-9795
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Canada
Phone: 613-533-9303
Fax: 613-544-9899
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Queen's Student Health Services
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V8
Canada
Phone: 613-533-2506
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lett & Forster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Forster ( CPSO# 82851 )
Dr. D. Lett ( CPSO# 80050 )

Business Address:
Queen's Health Counselling & Disability Services
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
Clergy Street Familiy Physicians
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone Number: (613) 542-7858

Business Address:
QHC BGH
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
Queen's Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Business Address:
Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 531-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN ANDREW LETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 27 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2005