Leung, Cheryl Sze Yiu (CPSO#: 86586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale Community
Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

E W Bickle Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institue
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 2255
Fax: (416) 539-6563
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl S.Y. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 86586 )

Business Address:
E.W. Bickle Cnetre
Toronto Rhabilitation Institute
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL SZE YIU LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010