Leung, Felix Kai-Ying (CPSO#: 74516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Ave
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P3E2
Phone: (416) 439-9253
Fax: (416) 439-3875
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 763-2526
Fax: (905) 763-8595
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 201
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 595-4975
Fax: (905) 595-4977
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Felix Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Leung ( CPSO# 74516 )

Business Address:
208 - 1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 439-9253

Business Address:
201 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 595-4975

Business Address:
201 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 763-2526

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELIX KAI-YING LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2000 to 05 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002