Leung, Frederick Chi Chung (CPSO#: 64040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly St W
Suite 503
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-3572
Fax: (905) 683-3578
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frederick Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Leung ( CPSO# 64040 )

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 503
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-3572

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK CHI CHUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992