Leung, James Chi Kay (CPSO#: 60309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 310
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 493-1314
Fax: (416) 502-3984
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung ( CPSO# 60309 )

Business Address:
310 - 385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 493-1314

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHI KAY LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991