Leung, Kent Kwan-Kin (CPSO#: 66650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit T33A
1661 Denison Street
Markham ON  L3R 6E4
Phone: (905) 470-6778
Fax: (905) 470-6779
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leung ( CPSO# 66650 )

Business Address:
Unit T33A
1661 Denison Street
Markham ON  L3R 6E4
Phone Number: (905) 470-6778

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENT KWAN-KIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007