Leung, See Lap (CPSO#: 58445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 110
1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 212-7132
Fax: (905) 212-1218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. See Lap Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leung ( CPSO# 58445 )

Business Address:
Unit 110
1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 212-7132

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEE LAP LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988