Leung, Stephanie Pui-Yee (CPSO#: 98762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie P.Y. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leung ( CPSO# 98762 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
H S C 4F1
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE PUI-YEE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017