Leung, William Pui Hung (CPSO#: 99281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

33 Drummond St W
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Canada
Phone: (613) 264-0638
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung ( CPSO# 99281 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM PUI HUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014