Levin, Leslie (CPSO#: 42506)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Les Levin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Hospital Department of Medical Oncology 610 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017