Levin, Morris Frank (CPSO#: 63208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
P O Box 2007 189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2009
Fax: (519) 631-8842
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris F. Levin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levin ( CPSO# 63208 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Radiology
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIS FRANK LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991