Levine, Mark Frank (CPSO#: 57802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levine ( CPSO# 57802 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
2211 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK FRANK LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1986