Levy, Deborah Merrill (CPSO#: 74185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228108
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Road
South Tower, 1st Floor
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-7397 Ext. 3508
Fax: (705) 523-7288
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH MERRILL LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009