Levy, Ron (CPSO#: 89803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Room 304 Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7444
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron Levy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levy ( CPSO# 89803 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Room 304 Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RON LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011