Leyland, Nicholas Albert (CPSO#: 52555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76696
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Care
Hamilton ON  L8N 4N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Leyland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leyland ( CPSO# 52555 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALBERT LEYLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEYLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986