Li, Bessie (CPSO#: 73220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 29
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone: (905) 944-0270
Fax: (905) 513-6634
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bessie Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li ( CPSO# 73220 )

Business Address:
29 - 7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone Number: (905) 944-0270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BESSIE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 10 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2001