Li, Christopher Wing-Hay (CPSO#: 66646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2590
Fax: 416-495-2479
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Health
Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7477
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher W. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li ( CPSO# 66646 )

Business Address:
404-4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 297-7277

Business Address:
The Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 15 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WING-HAY LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997