Li, Madeline Tsui-Yee (CPSO#: 73839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Room 749 16th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 7505
Fax: (416) 946-2047
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madeline Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li ( CPSO# 73839 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 749
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADELINE TSUI-YEE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005