Li, Ming (CPSO#: 104990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ningxia Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Ave E
Timmins And District Hospital
Timmins ON  P4N8P2
Canada
Phone: 705-267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ming Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Li ( CPSO# 104990)

Business Address:
123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
4715 ON-101 East
South Porcupine ON  P0N 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 235-6900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

China

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016