Liem, Joel Jonathan San Bing (CPSO#: 78631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Liem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liem ( CPSO# 78631 )

Business Address:
D - 1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (519) 258-4356

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 17 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL JONATHAN SAN BING LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2002 to 15 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 05 May 2003 to 01 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Sep 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2006