Liew, Trina Xian-Min (CPSO#: 75158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1A
3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: (416) 431-0648
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trina Liew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liew ( CPSO# 75158 )

Business Address:
1A - 3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRINA XIAN-MIN LIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002