Lim, Audrey Yen (CPSO#: 67817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Health Sciences Centre, 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76340
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Healthcare
System Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Audrey Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lim ( CPSO# 67817 )

Business Address:
Dept of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Health Sciences Centre, 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Singapore

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDREY YEN LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007