Lim, Sen-Mei (CPSO#: 68861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric A. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Dr. S. Lim ( CPSO# 68861 )
Dr. E. Clark ( CPSO# 69269 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 730-5058

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SEN-MEI LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997