Lin, Karen Wendy (CPSO#: 67921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3477 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R4
Phone: (416) 261-0588
Fax: (416) 261-8520
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lin ( CPSO# 67921 )

Business Address:
3477 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R4
Phone Number: (416) 261-0588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WENDY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996