Lindsay, Christopher Sean (CPSO#: 67854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Charles Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V8
Phone: (905) 830-9797
Fax: (905) 830-5107
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris S. Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lindsay ( CPSO# 67854 )

Business Address:
20 Charles Street
Unit 2
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 830-9797

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SEAN LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1999