Lindsay, Robert Mcgregor (CPSO#: 41995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Dec 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidney Care Centre
Westmount Mall
Suite 205
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 685-8349
Fax: (519) 685-8395
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC Victoria Hospital
Commissioner's Rd E
London ON  N6A 4G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53849
Fax: (519) 685-8395
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert McGregor Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lindsay ( CPSO# 41995 )

Business Address:
Kidney Care Centre
Westmount Mall
Suite 205
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8349

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MCGREGOR LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994