Ling, Francis Tien Kwan (CPSO#: 74765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 966-3888
Fax: (519) 967-8882
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francis T.K. Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ling ( CPSO# 74765 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 966-3888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS TIEN KWAN LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006