Lingley, Michael David (CPSO#: 64935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone: (905) 503-4522
Fax: (905) 503-4622
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5972
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Lingley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lingley ( CPSO# 64935 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
372 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 503-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID LINGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1998