Linkins, Lori-Ann (CPSO#: 68902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Thrombosis Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42640
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Linkins ( CPSO# 68902 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Department of Medicine
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Room A3-74
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 522-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI-ANN LINKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2000