Lipa, Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 64945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue M1 514
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6069
Fax: (416) 480-5795
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan E. Lipa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipa ( CPSO# 64945 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue M1 514
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6069

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH LIPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993