Liptay, Christine Marie (CPSO#: 65150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 487-3453
Fax: (416) 487-5528
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health and Welllness
University of Toronto
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 416 978-8030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE LIPTAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPTAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993