Liquornik, Karen Nadine (CPSO#: 87946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Paediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16700 bayview avenue
#215
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 953-7801
Fax: (905) 953-7803
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Stotland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Liquornik ( CPSO# 87946 )
Dr. B. Stotland ( CPSO# 75780 )

Business Address:
16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 216
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 836-4173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN NADINE LIQUORNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIQUORNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009