Lisnevskaia, Larissa Alexandrovna (CPSO#: 75802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kuban Medical Institute, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4986
Fax: (905) 721-6602
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 5, 4646 Dufferin St
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (647) 796-6950
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Lisnevskaia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lisnevskaia ( CPSO# 75802 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4987

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISSA ALEXANDROVNA LISNEVSKAIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISNEVSKAIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010