Liss, Gary Martin (CPSO#: 29175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-1150
Fax: (416) 256-0742
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Occupational Health Centre
LAMP Community Health Centre
185 Fifth Street
Toronto, ON M8V 2Z5
Toronto ON  M8V 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 252-9701
Fax: (416) 252-5100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY MARTIN LISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LISS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1979