Litner, Geoffrey Michael (CPSO#: 72582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
236 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Phone: (416) 922-2000
Fax: (416) 922-2005
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Litner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Litner ( CPSO# 72582 )
Dr. M. Litner ( CPSO# 76272 )

Business Address:
Medical Clinic
8000 Bathurst Street
Suite 2A
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone Number: (905) 709-9709

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY MICHAEL LITNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000