Liu, Barbara Arlena (CPSO#: 58247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room HG 69
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4076
Fax: (416) 480-4178
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Liu ( CPSO# 58247 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room HG 69
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4076

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ARLENA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988