Liu, Fei-Fei (CPSO#: 50940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2123
Fax: (416) 946-4586
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FF Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Liu ( CPSO# 50940 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 5-975
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2123

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEI-FEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1983