Liu, Geoffrey (CPSO#: 66529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 7 - 124
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 3428
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Liu ( CPSO# 66529 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 7-124
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
RFE 1st Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997