Liu, Peter Chuan-Lei (CPSO#: 89255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter C.L. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liu ( CPSO# 89255 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHUAN-LEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013