Liu, Regina Ching-Yin (CPSO#: 76029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6424
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Regina Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Liu ( CPSO# 76029 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REGINA CHING-YIN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007