Liu, Yuen Chi (CPSO#: 30450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone: (416) 438-6636
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3000 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough
Toronto ON  M1P 2V2
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-6636
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. C. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu ( CPSO# 30450 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
General Division
Diagnostic Imaging Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]


            As from January 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yuen Chi Liu, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Liu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Liu has voluntarily agreed to restrict his practice to diagnostic
                  radiology and has agreed not to perform interventional radiology.