Lo, Adrian Wai-Chit (CPSO#: 68204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Berczy Medical Clinic
Unit 3
20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone: (905) 887-3399
Fax: (905) 887-0462
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian W Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo ( CPSO# 68204 )

Business Address:
Berczy Medical Clinic
3 - 20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 887-3399

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN WAI-CHIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996